# NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Math Chapter 2 Whole Numbers

ncert class 6 maths

6th maths book

6th standard maths

class 6 maths solutions

ncert solutions for class 6 maths chapter 2 Whole Numbers for English Medium CBSE class 6 maths. Here in class 6 maths solutions learn to solve Whole Numbers problem’s solution and how to solve questions with easiest learning tricks. ncert class 6 maths. ncert solutions for class 6 maths chapter 2 by our experts team solved all questions for students.

NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Math chapter 2, 6th standard maths chapter 2 are part of NCERT 6th maths book. Here we have given NCERT Solutions for class 6 maths solutions.

Here we solve ncert class 6 maths chapter 2 solutions Whole Numbers in English for NCERT and English Medium CBSE class 6 maths concepts all questions with easy method with expert solutions. It help students in their study, home work and preparing for exam. Soon we provide ncert maths book class 6 chapter 2 solutions Whole Numbers question and answers solutions. NCERT Solutions for Class 6th standard maths chapter 2 Whole Numbers in free PDF here.

# NCERT SOLUTIONS FOR CLASS 6 MATH chapter 2

**Whole Numbers**

# 6th standard maths chapter 2

**NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Maths chapter 2**

ncert class 6 maths chapter 2

Ex . 2.1

ncert class 6 maths chapter 2

Ex . 2.1

EXERCISE 2.1**1. Write the next three natural numbers after 10999.****Answer –** The next three natural numbers after 10999 are –

10999 + 1 = 11000

11000 + 1 = 11001

11001 + 1 = 11002

**2. Write the three whole numbers occurring just before 10001.****Answer –** The three whole numbers occurring just before 10001 are –

10001 – 1 = 10000

10000 – 1 = 9999

9999 – 1 = 9998

**3. Which is the smallest whole number?****Answer –** The smallest whole number 0

**4. How many whole numbers are there between 32 and 53?****Answer –** 20 whole numbers are there between 32 and 53.

**5. Write the successor of :**

(a) 2440701 | (b) 100199 | (c) 1099999 | (d) 2345670 |

**Answer – ****(a) 2440701**

2440701 + 1 = 2440702

**(b) 100199**

100199 + 1 = 100200

**(c) 1099999**

1099999 + 1 = 1100000

**(d) 2345670**

2345670 + 2345671

6. Write the predecessor of :

(a) 94 | (b) 10000 | (c) 208090 | (d) 7654321 |

**Answer –** **(a) 94**

94 − 1 = 93

**(b) 10000**

10000 − 1 = 9999

**(c) 208090**

208090 − 1 = 208089

**(d) 7654321**

7654321 − 1 = 7654320

**7. In each of the following pairs of numbers, state which whole number is on the left of the other number on the number line. Also write them with the appropriate sign (>, <) between them.**

(a) 530, 503 | (b) 370, 307 | (c) 98765, 56789 | (d) 9830415, 10023001 |

**Answer – ****(a) 530, 503****Sol –** 530 > 503

So, 503 is right side of 530 on numbers line.

**(b) 370, 307****Sol –** 370 > 307

So, 307 is right side of 370 on numbers line.

**(c) 98765, 56789****Sol –** 98765 > 56789

So, 56789 is right side of 98765 on numbers line.

**(d) 9830415, 10023001****Sol –** 10023001 < 9830415

So, 9830415 is right side of 10023001 on numbers line.

8. Which of the following statements are true (T) and which are false (F)?

(a) Zero is the smallest natural number.

(b) 400 is the predecessor of 399.

(c) Zero is the smallest whole number.

(d) 600 is the successor of 599.

(e) All natural numbers are whole numbers.

(f ) All whole numbers are natural numbers.

(g) The predecessor of a two digit number is never a single digit number.

(h) 1 is the smallest whole number.

(i) The natural number 1 has no predecessor.

(j) The whole number 1 has no predecessor.

(k) The whole number 13 lies between 11 and 12.

(l) The whole number 0 has no predecessor.

(m) The successor of a two digit number is always a two digit number.**Answer – **

(a) Zero is the smallest natural number. | (F) |

(b) 400 is the predecessor of 399. | (F) |

(c) Zero is the smallest whole number. | (T) |

(d) 600 is the successor of 599. | (T) |

(e) All natural numbers are whole numbers. | (T) |

(f ) All whole numbers are natural numbers. | (F) |

(g) The predecessor of a two digit number is never a single digit number. | (F) |

(h) 1 is the smallest whole number. | (F) |

(i) The natural number 1 has no predecessor. | (T) |

(k) The whole number 13 lies between 11 and 12. | (F) |

(l) The whole number 0 has no predecessor. | (T) |

(m) The successor of a two digit number is always a two digit number. | (F) |

**EXERCISE 2.2**

1. Find the sum by suitable rearrangement :

(a) 837 + 208 + 363 | (b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647 |

**Answer – ****(a) 837 + 208 + 363 ****Sol –** (837 + 363) + 208

= 1200 + 208

= 1408

**(b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647 ****Sol –** (1962 + 1538) + (453 + 647)

= 3500 + 1100

= 4600

**2. Find the product by suitable rearrangement :**

(a) 2 × 1768 × 50 | (b) 4 × 166 × 25 | (c) 8 × 291 × 125 |

(d) 625 × 279 × 16 | (e) 285 × 5 × 60 | (f) 125 × 40 × 8 × 25 |

**Answer – ****(a) 2 × 1768 × 50 ****Sol –** 2 × 50 × 1768

= 100 × 1768

= 176800

**(b) 4 × 166 × 25 ****Sol –** 4 × 25 × 166

= 100 × 166

= 16600

**(c) 8 × 291 × 125 ****Sol –** 8 × 125 × 291

= 1000 × 291

= 291000

**(d) 625 × 279 × 16 ****Sol –** 625 × 16 × 279

= 10000 × 279

= 2790000

**(e) 285 × 5 × 60 ****Sol –** 285 × 300

= 85500

**(f) 125 × 40 × 8 × 25 ****Sol –** 125 × 8 × 40 × 25

= 1000 × 1000

= 1000000

**3. Find the value of the following :**

(a) 297 × 17 + 297 × 3 | (b) 54279 × 92 + 8 × |

(c) 81265 × 169 – 81265 × 69 | (d) 3845 × 5 × 782 + 769 × 25 × 218 |

**Answer – ****(a) 297 × 17 + 297 × 3****Sol –** 297 × (17 + 3)

= 297 × 20

= 5940

**(b) 54279 × 92 + 8 × 54279****Sol –** 54279 × (92 + 8)

= 54279 × 100

= 5427900

**(c) 81265 × 169 – 81265 × 69****Sol –** 81265 × (169 − 69)

= 81265 × 100

= 8126500

**(d) 3845 × 5 × 782 + 769 × 25 × 218****Sol –** 3845 × 5 × (782 + 218)

= 19225 × 1000

= 19225000

**4. Find the product using suitable properties.**

(a) 738 × 103 | (b) 854 × 102 | (c) 258 × 1008 | 1005 × 168 |

**Answer – ****(a) 738 × 103****Sol –** 738 × (100 + 3) 3 (Distributive property)

= 738 × 100 + 738 × 3

= 73800 + 2214

= 76014

**(b) 854 × 102****Sol –** 854 × 100 + 854 × 2 (Distributive property)

= 85400 + 1708

= 87108

**(c) 258 × 1008 ****Sol –** 258 × (1000 + 8)

= 258 × 1000 + 258 × 8 (Distributive property)

= 258000 + 2064

= 260064

**(d) 1005 × 168 ****Sol –** (1000 + 5) × 168

= 1000 × 168 + 5 × 168 (Distributive property)

= 168000 + 840

= 168840

**5. A taxidriver filled his car petrol tank with 40 litres of petrol on Monday. The next day, he filled the tank with 50 litres of petrol. If the petrol costs rs 44 per litre, how much did he spend in all on petrol?****Sol –** Quantity of petrol filled on Monday = 40 l

Quantity of petrol filled on Tuesday = 50 l

Total quantity filled = (40 + 50) l

Cost of petrol (per l) = Rs 44

Total money spent = 44 × (40 + 50)

= 44 × 90 = Rs 3960

**6. A vendor supplies 32 litres of milk to a hotel in the morning and 68 litres of milk in the evening. If the milk costs rs 45 per litre, how much money is due to the vendor per day?****Sol –** Quantity of milk supplied in the morning = 32 l

Quantity of milk supplied in the evening = 68 l

Total of milk per litre = (32 + 68) l

Cost of milk per litre = Rs 15

Total cost per day = 15 × (32 + 68)

= 15 × 100 = Rs 1500

**7. Match the following :**

(i) 425 × 136 = 425 × (6 + 30 + 100) | (a) Commutativity under multiplication. |

(ii) 2 × 49 × 50 = 2 × 50 × 49 | (b) Commutativity under addition. |

(iii) 80 + 2005 + 20 = 80 + 20 + 2005 | (c) Distributivity of multiplication over addition. |

**Answer – **

(i) 425 × 136 = 425 × (6 + 30 + 100) | (c) Distributivity of multiplication over addition. |

(ii) 2 × 49 × 50 = 2 × 50 × 49 | (a) Commutativity under multiplication. |

(iii) 80 + 2005 + 20 = 80 + 20 + 2005 | (b) Commutativity under addition. |

## EXERCISE 2.3

1. Which of the following will not represent zero :

(a) 1 + 0 | (b) 0 × 0 | (c) \(\displaystyle \frac{0}{2}\) | (d) \(\displaystyle \frac{10-10}{2}\) |

**Answer – ****(a) 1 + 0****Sol –** 1 + 0

= 1

No, it is not represent zero.

** (b) 0 × 0****Sol –** 0

Yes, it is represent zero.

**(c) \(\displaystyle \frac{0}{2}\)****Sol –** 0

Yes, it is represent zero.

**(d) \(\displaystyle \frac{10-10}{2}\)****Sol –** \(\displaystyle \frac{0}{2}\)

Yes, it is represent zero.

**2. If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will be zero? Justify through examples.****Sol –** If the product of 2 whole numbers is zero, then one of them is definitely zero.

For example, 0 × 2 = 0 and 17 × 0 = 0

If the product of 2 whole numbers is zero, then both of them may be zero.

0 × 0 = 0

However, 2 × 3 = 6

(Since numbers to be multiplied are not equal to zero, the result of the product will also be non-zero.)

**3. If the product of two whole numbers is 1, can we say that one or both of them will be 1? Justify through examples.****Sol –** If the product of 2 numbers is 1, then both the numbers have to be equal to 1.

For example, 1 × 1 = 1

However, 1 × 6 = 6

Clearly, the product of two whole numbers will be 1 in the situation when both numbers to be multiplied are 1.

**4. Find using distributive property :**

(a) 728 × 101 | (b) 5437 × 1001 | (c) 824 × 25 | (d) 4275 × 125 | (e) 504 × 35 |

**Answer – ****(a) 728 × 101****Sol –** 728 × (100 + 1)

= 728 × 100 + 728 × 1

= 72800 + 728

= 73528

**(b) 5437 × 1001 ****Sol –** 5437 × (1000 + 1)

= 5437 × 1000 + 5437 × 1

= 5437000 + 5437

= 5442437

**(c) 824 × 25 ****Sol –** (800 + 24) × 25

= (800 + 25 − 1) × 25

= 800 × 25 + 25 × 25 − 1 × 25

= 20000 + 625 − 25

= 20000 + 600

= 20600

**(d) 4275 × 125 ****Sol –** (4000 + 200 + 100 − 25) × 125

= 4000 × 125 + 200 × 125 + 100 × 125 − 25 × 125

= 500000 + 25000 + 12500 − 3125

= 534375

**(e) 504 × 35 ****Sol –** (500 + 4) × 35

= 500 × 35 + 4 × 35

= 17500 + 140

= 17640

**5. Study the pattern :**

1 × 8 + 1 = 9 | 1234 × 8 + 4 = 9876 |

12 × 8 + 2 = 98 | 12345 × 8 + 5 = 98765 |

123 × 8 + 3 = 987 |

**Write the next two steps. Can you say how the pattern works?****(Hint: 12345 = 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1).****Answer – **

123456 × 8 + 6 = 987648 + 6 = 987654

1234567 × 8 + 7 = 9876536 + 7 = 9876543

Yes, the pattern works.

As 123456 = 111111 + 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1,

123456 × 8 = (111111 + 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1) × 8

= 111111 × 8 + 11111 × 8 + 1111 × 8 + 111 × 8 + 11 × 8 + 1 × 8

= 888888 + 88888 + 8888 + 888 + 88 + 8 = 987648

123456 × 8 + 6 = 987648 + 6 = 987654